Financial history YORK EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity Number: 1170144
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £145.32k £172.92k £123.29k £136.18k £143.95k
Total expenditure £131.18k £157.41k £123.03k £123.86k £126.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A