LEE GARDENS POOL COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lee Gardens Pool Committee was set up to re-open Lee Gardens Pool, Penrhiwceiber, Mountain Ash, RCT. The pool closed in 2013. The Committee was set up in 2015. In 2016 the pool re-opened. Lee Gardens Pool Committee carry out the day-to-day running of and fundraising for the project while Lee Gardens Volunteers carry out the general maintenance. Lee Gardens Volunteers is an intergenerational group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £42,527 from 7 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
52 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 15 February 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADAM STEPHEN FOX | Chair | 15 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Susan Elizabeth Grandon | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cara Jane Taylor | Trustee | 07 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
DIANE LOCKE | Trustee | 15 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE NEADS | Trustee | 15 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.52k | £64.87k | £402.05k | £342.79k | £135.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.82k | £78.78k | £66.83k | £136.48k | £164.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.80k | £26.92k | £52.93k | £42.53k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PENRHIWCEIBER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 RAILWAY TERRACE
MOUNTAIN ASH
CF45 3ST
- Phone:
- 07775792543
- Email:
- leegardenspool@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window