Governing document THE SHEFFIELD CLUB FOR THE HARD OF HEARING
Charity number: 508925
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 21 MAY 1951 AS AMENDED 22 JULY 1979, 8 MARCH 1993, 16 MARCH 1998, 22 MARCH 1999, 20 MARCH 2000 AND 12 MARCH 2007. as amended on 19 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WITH A HEARING LOSS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
SHEFFIELD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.