Financial history TARPORLEY & DISTRICT U3A

Charity Number: 1171370
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £41.26k £6.15k £18.65k £29.74k £36.90k
Total expenditure £44.48k £7.16k £15.03k £28.15k £35.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A