Trustees TARPORLEY & DISTRICT U3A
Charity Number: 1171370

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Jones | Chair | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Wilson | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Mary Green | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Lyne | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon William Dunning | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Graham Schofield | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Barson | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hardacre | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Moroney | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANET LINSELL | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Tyson Jones | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graham Parker | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAUL DAVID BERNARD BUJAC | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.