Governing document YORKSHIRE COUNTY BOWLING ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity number: 508927
Up to date
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED SEPTEMBER 1956 AMENDED 15 NOVEMBER 1969, 18 NOVEMBER 1972, 17 NOVEMBER 1979, 20 NOVEMBER 1983 AND 19 NOVEMBER 1983
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST YORKSHIRE BOWLERS AND/OR THEIR DEPENDANTS, WHO FROM AGE, ILLNESS, INFIRMITY OR ANY OTHER CAUSES ARE IN FINANCIAL NEED.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.