ATHERTON & LEIGH SHELTER FOR HOPE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Atherton & Leigh Shelter for HoPe trustees made a decision following long discussions to close the charity as a result of the opening of 3 emergency night shelters, with a total of 54 beds, in Wigan & Leigh run by The Brick and funded by Wigan Council. As we close the charity we will disperse remaining funds to other charities currently active in helping those in the Atherton and Leigh area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Wigan
Governance
- 24 October 2016: CIO registration
- 12 July 2022: Removed (Removed by application)
- 12 July 2022: Funds transferred to 1130715 THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 25/04/2017 | 01/04/2018 | 01/04/2019 | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.75k | £1.89k | £1.89k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.14k | £4.21k | £4.21k | £2.33k | £3.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 02 February 2022 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 02 February 2022 | 366 days late | |
Annual return | 01 April 2019 | 01 February 2022 | 731 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2019 | 02 February 2022 | 732 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF HOMELESS PEOPLE IN GREATER MANCHESTER, IN PARTICULAR THE WIGAN BOROUGH, BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, SUPPORT AND SERVICES, WITHIN A CHRISTIAN ETHOS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window