WIGAN HERITAGE AND MINING MONUMENT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees announced that they were undertaking a fundraising exercise to raise upto £150k in order to fund the building of a mining monument to commemorate the many thousands of people who worked in or were affected by mining, and the crucial role which mining played in the development of the town. The design and construction of the statue has been contracted to artist Steve Winterburn.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wigan
Governance
- 24 January 2017: CIO registration
- 14 March 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
- 14 March 2023: Funds transferred to 513511 Lancashire Mining Museum Limited
- WHAMM (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.99k | £24.82k | £22.68k | £889 | £125 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.21k | £37.79k | £51.08k | £42.47k | £3.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 January 2023 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 January 2023 | 77 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE TOWN OF WIGAN IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF WIGAN: (1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECT OF THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF MINING WIGAN AND ITS IMPACT ON THE TOWN AND ITS PEOPLE (2) TO PROMOTE THE ENHANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE AREA BY THE CREATION, ERECTION AND MAINTENANCE OF A MONUMENT IN A PROMINENT TOWN CENTRE LOCATION TO COMMEMORATE THE MANY THOUSANDS OF PEOPLE WHO WORKED IN AND WERE AFFECTED BY MINING, AND THE CRUCIAL ROLE WHICH MINING PLAYED IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE TOWN.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window