Financial history UNITED METHODIST CHURCH (UK)

Charity number: 1169890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.11m £924.14k £905.94k £821.80k £1.33m
Total expenditure £884.36k £393.91k £374.84k £533.63k £1.05m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.11m £921.63k £904.32k £820.74k £1.33m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.67k £2.51k £1.62k £1.05k £3.87k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £786.78k £365.83k £371.85k £518.05k £1.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds £97.58k £28.08k £2.99k £15.58k £35.39k
Expenditure - Governance £8.40k £9.12k £9.12k £9.12k £9.49k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0