Trustees UNITED METHODIST CHURCH (UK)
Charity number: 1169890

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tutsirai Godfrey Fusire | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mudiwa Shakespear Chikukwa | Trustee | 11 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shelton Musafare | Trustee | 11 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Betsva | Trustee | 11 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elphas Gunguwo | Trustee | 11 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Egipher Masenda | Trustee | 11 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Walter Danai Kanjanda | Trustee | 11 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nyasha Enock Mapfeka | Trustee | 11 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tavonashe Hungwe | Trustee | 11 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ruvimbo Betsva | Trustee | 11 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Priscilla Agnes Karumazondo | Trustee | 11 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Kapumha | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rugare Musekiwa Mojapelo | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angeline Mutyora | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zvikomborero Patience Mudambanuki | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Xmas Gombakomba | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.