NORTH YARD COMMUNITY TRUST CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of any charitable purposes for the benefit of the communities in the neighbourhoods of Barne Barton, St Budeaux, Keyham, Weston Mill and Kings Tamerton.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 12 January 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMMA VICTORIA MILLER | Chair | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joshua McCarty | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Freeman | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Jean Taylor | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Manning | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jon Dingle | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samuel James Carr | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
SHARON HILL | Trustee | 12 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £182.92k | £180.69k | £194.47k | £219.85k | £250.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.87k | £14.06k | £50.91k | £32.61k | £73.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITIES IN THE NEIGHBOURHOODS OF BARNE BARTON, KEYHAM, ST BUDEAUX AND KINGS TAMERTON, AND WESTON MILL IN THE CITY OF PLYMOUTH (THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS DEFINED BY THE MAP ON THE TRUST'S WEBSITE) AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, CITIZENSHIP AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT, AND THE PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORTH YARD COMMUNITY TRUST CIO
C/O Promoting Children in Plymouth
Plymouth Science Park
Derriford
PLYMOUTH
PL6 8BX
- Phone:
- 01752764455
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window