Financial history BAYT AL QAIM ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity number: 1171666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £36.36k £98.17k £110.10k £102.33k £109.74k
Total expenditure £43.60k £38.34k £82.02k £72.85k £99.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A