FLEETVILLE SWING BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fleetville Swing Band is a friendly, welcoming band with adult players of all ages who enjoy playing swing, jazz and big band music. We comprise both professional and amateur musicians from the St Albans area. Our vision is that community bonds can be strengthened by making music together. We perform about once a month and always try to support local charity events, free of charge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 30 November 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW COX | Chair | 30 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sirina Wooster | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Strain | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cameron Ross | Trustee | 17 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALEX GOULD | Trustee | 30 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ELIZABETH Evans | Trustee | 30 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.05k | £2.81k | £3.36k | £3.25k | £5.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £597 | £1.94k | £2.59k | £3.40k | £5.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 20 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 30 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Beaumont Avenue
St Albans
AL1 4TL
- Phone:
- 07795435806
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window