THE HANOVER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants to individuals and other charities for relief of poverty and to advance the Orthodox Jewish religion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- United States
Governance
- 29 November 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROCHELLE FLAM | Chair | 29 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
BERISCH LUDMIR | Trustee | 29 November 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £430.51k | £422.82k | £121.72k | £357.63k | £298.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £172.22k | £137.12k | £120.35k | £225.64k | £232.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 March 2025 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 March 2025 | 133 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 March 2025 | 499 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 March 2025 | 499 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
(I)THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING GRANTS OR LOANS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; (II) TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CODE OF JEWISH LAW (SHULCHAN ARUCH).
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 ASHTEAD ROAD
LONDON
E5 9BH
- Phone:
- 020 8880 8910
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window