THE AFRICAN WOMEN'S FORUM, PORTSMOUTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote African culture within our community of Portsmouth and surrounding areas by celebrating African peoples' history and achievements. We collaborate in cultural and educational projects with Portsmouth city council and other statutory and community groups. We promote positive images of Africans and especially of African women for our young.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £5,718 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Portsmouth City
- Liberia
Governance
- 19 April 2017: CIO registration
- AWF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARIE COSTA | Chair | 18 January 2017 |
|
|||||
MAHBUBA ABDULLAH | Trustee | 18 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
HONORINE DJENABA-MACDONALD | Trustee | 18 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
AYELECHE ARTHUR-KIFLE | Trustee | 18 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
BAMEDELE PERPETUA EGHAREVBA | Trustee | 18 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.08k | £214 | £2.55k | £1.08k | £5.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.35k | £1.33k | £1.73k | £10.78k | £6.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.50k | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | £5.72k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE IN PORTSMOUTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF OR CREED (IN PARTICULAR, WOMEN OF AFRICAN DESCENT) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: A. PROVIDING A LOCAL NETWORK GROUP THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES WOMEN OF AFRICAN DESCENT TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY; B. INCREASING, OR CO-ORDINATING, OPPORTUNITIES FOR WOMEN OF AFRICAN DESCENT TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS, TO ENABLE THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT SERVICES TO BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF THAT GROUP 2. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, EDUCATION AND INFORMATION OF MEDICAL CONDITIONS THAT ARE COMMON IN MEN AND WOMEN OF AFRICAN DESCENT INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO DIABETES AND HIGH BLOOD PRESSURE, BOWEL, BREAST AND TESTICULAR CANCER, SICKLE CELL ANAEMIA AND FEMALE GENITAL MUTILATION (FGM), 3. TO PROMOTE RACIAL HARMONY BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS WITHIN, THOUGH NOT RESTRICTED TO, PORTSMOUTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA 4. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY, CULTURE AND TRADITIONS OF AFRICAN PEOPLES 5. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN AFRICA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE VILLAGE OF TEEKPEH IN LIBERIA BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 WILTON PLACE
SOUTHSEA
PO5 2BG
- Phone:
- 07758805316
- Email:
- awf07@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.