THE MITOCHONDRIAL RESEARCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in general (and particularly amongst scientists, NHS staffs and health professionals) on the subject of obesity and to promote research for the public benefit in all aspect of the subject and to publish the useful results. To promote and protect the physical and mental health of severely obese people in England (London primarily), but not exclusively.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 May 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ALI REZA KASMATI PHD | Chair | 20 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gazi Tasfia Farhat | Trustee | 31 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lamyah Sultana Meem | Trustee | 13 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Juc | Trustee | 13 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALIREZA MOHAZZEB-JAHROMI | Trustee | 20 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200 | £500 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £500 | £200 | £0 | £100 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 28 June 2024 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (AND PARTICULARLY AMONGST SCIENTISTS, NHS STAFFS AND HEALTH PROFESSIONALS) ON THE SUBJECT OF OBESITY AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THAT SUBJECT AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SEVERELY OBESE PEOPLE IN LONDON PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
73 PARTINGTON CLOSE
LONDON
N19 3DY
- Phone:
- 07894085406
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window