Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ST LAWRENCE, BARNWOOD. GLOUCESTER

Charity Number: 1170167
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £111.15k £77.37k £86.67k £90.05k £107.94k
Total expenditure £112.97k £102.77k £94.74k £100.42k £105.89k
Income from government contracts £5.00k £3.38k £5.72k £4.23k £5.32k
Income from government grants £225 £225 £225 N/A £225