Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ST LAWRENCE, BARNWOOD. GLOUCESTER
Charity Number: 1170167

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT EDWIN CROFTON | Chair | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Alan Rawlinson | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lorraine Anne Lewis | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Little | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Mackenzie Pooley | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Margaret Groves | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Sharon Nicola Francesca Edge | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH HINTON | Trustee | 14 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP JAEKEL | Trustee | 14 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES MULVEY | Trustee | 14 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WEBSTER | Trustee | 14 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev AUDREY HAYMAN | Trustee | 14 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET SEYERS | Trustee | 14 December 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.