SOUTHAMPTON CANOE CLUB

Charity Number: 1171807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation for the benefit of the inhabitants of Southampton and persons living in and around Hampshire by the provision of facilities for kayaking and canoeing. We offer affordable fitness sessions year round for club members. The use of structured fitness regimes also help one be part of the marathon kayaking racing team if they wish to do so.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £23,237
Total expenditure: £17,026

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire
  • Southampton City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 February 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip George Amey Trustee 29 June 2024
None on record
Giles Hudson Trustee 29 June 2024
None on record
STEVE RANCE Trustee 29 April 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £25.95k £19.06k £14.83k £18.48k £23.24k
Total expenditure £16.54k £16.17k £15.19k £22.40k £17.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 16 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 December 2020 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 December 2020 36 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SOUTHAMPTON CANOE CLUB
Woodmill Outdoor Centre
Woodmill Lane
SOUTHAMPTON
SO18 2JR
Phone:
07769691809