HAYWILL ANIMAL RESCUE AND THERAPY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To rescue/rehabilitate/rehome animals of all types. To provide a safe haven for those that cannot be rehomed. To provide animal assisted therapy for those people who require it without exclusion or discrimination
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 April 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYNN PATRICIA HAYDON-WILLIAMS | Chair | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANE BROWN | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
LYNN HAYDON-WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2018 | 01/09/2019 | 01/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.58k | £20.67k | £34.47k | £34.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.50k | £11.28k | £34.47k | £34.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days | |
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 698 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 698 days | |
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 28 April 2023 | 301 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | 28 April 2023 | 301 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | 04 May 2022 | 307 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | 04 May 2022 | 307 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2019 | 09 April 2021 | 282 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 SEP 2015 AS AMENDED ON 13 APR 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE: A) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS B) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND PROMOTE GOOD MENTAL HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF ANIMAL ASSISTED THERAPIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Haywill Animal Rescue Centre
Hague Street
GLOSSOP
SK13 8NR
- Phone:
- 01613519333
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window