BOLD RANGERS JFC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bold Rangers Junior Football Club is a UK Registered Charity who enable kids to play football without all the heavy costs associated to it. If needed then we will supply the child with everything including football boots and shin pads. We also give children the chance to play competitive football. We also work with the local schools and the local housing association.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- St Helens
Governance
- 28 November 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK ANTHONY FAIRBROTHER | Chair | 28 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.89k | £20.48k | £24.43k | £41.37k | £31.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.50k | £17.86k | £30.75k | £51.00k | £32.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 19 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 19 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PARR AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
69 ILFRACOMBE ROAD
SUTTON LEACH
ST. HELENS
WA9 4NN
- Phone:
- 07947946171
- Email:
- brteammanagement@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window