Financial history OUR VILLAGES CRAWCROOK AND GREENSIDE CIO

Charity Number: 1173252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £14.50k £4.79k £15.87k £16.99k £54.24k
Total expenditure £12.35k £10.07k £9.84k £27.77k £31.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £4.50k N/A N/A