SITAR MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organising public concerts, baithaks, workshops, summer schools and related activities in sitar and other aspects of Indian Classical Music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 November 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DHARAMBIR SINGH DHADYALLA MBE | Chair | 03 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr ANITABEN MISTRY | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
ATULKUMAR BHOGILAL PATEL MBE | Trustee | 14 August 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.73k | £1.57k | £115 | £634 | £10.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.90k | £1.57k | £113 | £440 | £2.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Nov 2016 as amended on 24 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ALL ASPECTS OF INDIAN CLASSICAL MUSIC AND DANCE, FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN LEICESTER AND THE UNITED KINGDOM. (C) TO CREATE OPPORTUNITIES FOR TEACHING, MENTORING, TRAINING, AND GAINING QUALIFICATIONS AT ALL LEVELS OF SITAR PLAYING AND RELATED INSTRUMENTS. (D) TO PROMOTE EXCELLENCE IN ALL ASPECTS OF PERFORMANCE OF THE SITAR AND RELATED INSTRUMENTS FOR UK-BASED MUSICIANS AND THE WIDER PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
93 Empingham Drive
Syston
Leicester
LE7 2DL
- Phone:
- 07810530985
- Email:
- uksitar@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window