Financial history COLLEGIUM LAUREATUM

Charity number: 1169986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £24.48k £2.61k £13.37k £26.39k £23.19k
Total expenditure £20.07k £3.44k £14.94k £26.28k £24.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A