Trustees COLLEGIUM LAUREATUM
Charity number: 1169986

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORNA JEAN COX | Chair | 04 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Lythgoe | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Mitchell | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP MARTIN BLAKELY | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Anthony John spring | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Timothy Cawston Radden | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Margaret Pippard | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ann Prentice CBE | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr SARAH MARGARET VIVIAN SMALLEY | Trustee | 04 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HATHAWAY | Trustee | 14 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
NEIL AUBREY CAPLAN | Trustee | 04 July 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.