ISLINGTON UNITED REFORMED CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
. The advancement of the Christian Faith for the benefit of the public in accordance with the Scheme of Union of the United Reformed Church. ACTIVITIES: .Christian Meditation, Sunday Breakfast for homeless and people in low income, Photo and Poster exhibitions and our monthly First Fridays social evenings of Christian films, Quiz nights, Music recitals and Games.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Islington
Governance
- 24 November 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Juan Edilberto Calle La Rosa | Trustee | 06 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
BASSEY ASIBONG | Trustee | 11 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BRAIN | Trustee | 17 September 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £167.16k | £120.97k | £100.43k | £97.65k | £115.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.66k | £125.66k | £104.58k | £103.63k | £94.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 571 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 571 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SCHEME OF UNION OF THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HARECOURT UNITED REFORMED CHURCH
120 ST. PAULS ROAD
LONDON
N1 2LR
- Phone:
- 020772264690
- Email:
- islingtonurc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window