EUSEBIA HOPE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity caters for orphaned children and vulnerable children in the village of Igoji, Meru, Kenya. We provide shelter, clothing, healthcare, education and support in interventions that help children make sense of their past, so that they are able to move on to a future where they can achieve positive outcomes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
- Kenya
Governance
- 15 February 2017: Standard registration
- EHF (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Micahel Dunn | Chair | 06 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Clare Elisabeth Rockingham Khan | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alison Parks | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christine Black-Nyaga | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.98k | £15.35k | £16.07k | £16.50k | £12.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.11k | £14.48k | £13.24k | £21.69k | £12.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 10 July 2024 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2022 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH OF PERSONS, ESPECIALLY CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION THOSE AFFECTED BY HIV/AIDS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ACCOMODATION, SUPPORT, FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND IN IN THE MERU DISTRICT OF KENYA AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS, ESPECIALLY CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED IN IN THE MERU DISTRICT OF KENYA AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS AND BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (C) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN IN THE MERU DISTRICT OF KENYA AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING: ACCOMMODATION, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 ULSTAN CLOSE
WOLDINGHAM
CATERHAM
CR3 7EH
- Phone:
- 07957370873
- Email:
- eusebiahope@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window