Trustees THE RYLSTONE DISTRICT WAR MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 1169911

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN RICHARD CARLISLE | Chair | 26 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Edward Webster | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Georgiana Scully | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Annesley Kay Butcher | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robin William Nelson | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter David White | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Anne Baines | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Gordon Jackson | Trustee | 15 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alan Gene Horn | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Scargill Armstrong | Trustee | 26 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MICHAEL REEDAY | Trustee | 26 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CLARKSON WADE | Trustee | 26 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Magoolagan | Trustee | 26 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.