LOCKING CASTLE CHURCH

Charity number: 1170425
Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are an Ecumenical church partnership of 4 denominations (Anglican, Baptist, Methodist and URC) operating out of our purpose-built premises in Locking Castle Weston-super-Mare. The church is open to all and offers Christian worship, bible study groups and social activities for all ages. We aim to follow the way of Jesus, serving the community - particularly Weston's new estates.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £119,573
Total expenditure: £138,790

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • North Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 November 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • LOCKING CASTLE CHRISTIAN PARTNERSHIP (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Daniel John Dinsmore Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
LINDA FRANCES THOMAS Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Alison Jane Elizabeth Castrey Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Neville Cranston Brownlee Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Adele Lloyd Trustee 04 October 2020
WESTON-SUPER-MARE AND BURNHAM-ON-SEA METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Katherine Mary Hollis Trustee 01 July 2018
None on record
CATHY BOND Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
ANDREW PEARCE Trustee 14 November 2016
None on record
MARTIN GEORGE PURNELL Trustee 09 October 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £157.85k £153.26k £145.41k £175.86k £119.57k
Total expenditure £151.28k £165.75k £141.06k £168.40k £138.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 June 2024 232 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 June 2024 232 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
JASMINE WAY
WESTON-SUPER-MARE
BS24 7JW
Phone:
01934 519888