PILLATON VILLAGE HALL CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Village Hall and environs are available to parishioners and those in surrounding areas for events and functions. Fund raising events are organised on a regular basis by the trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 13 January 2017: CIO registration
- 26 April 2017: Funds received from 284234 PILLATON VILLAGE HALL
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Dolley | Chair | 13 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Bailey | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsteen June Mims | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Roser | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Bunkum | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Johnson | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robin Dwane | Trustee | 26 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Chris Ley | Trustee | 13 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Shirley Floyd | Trustee | 13 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carole Hoskin | Trustee | 13 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Brian Henderson | Trustee | 13 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan White | Trustee | 13 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.20k | £37.38k | £28.82k | £18.07k | £7.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.89k | £23.72k | £35.50k | £22.43k | £12.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.60k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Jan 2017 as amended on 07 Mar 2020 as amended on 16 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF PARISH OF PILLATON IN THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Barton Meadow
Pillaton
Saltash
PL12 6SE
- Phone:
- 07972817086
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window