DUDLEY INCLUSIVE ACTIVITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Delivering innovative non-traditional weekly sport and physical activity sessions to children and young people with disabilities. We have a variety of clubs which support particular needs including clubs for people with physical disabilities and clubs for people with severe learning disabilities. The charity also has a volunteer academy which is helping to widen disability awareness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Dudley
Governance
- 31 January 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GREG SOUTHALL | Chair | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MOORBY | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER BINNION | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH JONES | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.06k | £19.48k | £24.98k | £13.52k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.09k | £22.25k | £20.44k | £9.20k | £1.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £920 | £1.99k | £1.50k | £1.48k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2022 | 311 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2022 | 311 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 March 2022 | 513 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 March 2022 | 513 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED WITHIN THE DUDLEY BOROUGH IN PARTICULAR BY IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE AND ASSISTING IN THE INTEGRATION INTO SOCIETY OF PEOPLE WITH A DISABILITY THROUGH A RANGE OF SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL ACTIVITIES, RECREATIONAL AND COMPETITIVE SPORTS WHICH ENCOURAGE AND FACILITATE THEIR PARTICIPATION (IN SUCH SPECIALISED ACTIVITIES) AND ASSISTING WITH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES FOR THEIR BENEFIT IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
144 MILL STREET
BRIERLEY HILL
DY5 2TL
- Phone:
- 07875646812
- Website:
-
dudleyinclusiveactivities.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window