AFGHAN SIKH EKTA CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION AND OPERATION OF A GURDWARA (PLACE OF WORSHIP) TO BE LOCATED IN THE GREATER BIRMINGHAM AREA AND COMMEMORATE THE LIFE AND TEACHINGS OF GURU ARJAN DEV JI, THE FIFTH SIKH GURU AND THE FIRST SIKH MARTYR TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE FOLLOWING SUBJECTS: LANGUAGES, (IN PARTICULAR PUNJABI) SIKH BELIEF
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
- Sandwell
Governance
- 17 February 2017: CIO registration
- GURU ARJAN DEV JI GURDWARA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GURNAM SINGH SAPRA | Chair | 17 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
MANMEET SINGH | Trustee | 17 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ragbir Singh Kapoor | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
SURBIR SINGH GABBA | Trustee | 17 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
JAGJIT SINGH GURWARA | Trustee | 17 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.66k | £29.51k | £22.44k | £26.07k | £7.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.62k | £5.01k | £12.30k | £53.70k | £1.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION AND OPERATION OF A GURDWARA (PLACE OF WORSHIP) TO BE LOCATED IN THE GREATER BIRMINGHAM AREA AND COMMEMORATE THE LIFE AND TEACHINGS OF GURU ARJAN DEV JI, THE FIFTH SIKH GURU AND THE FIRST SIKH MARTYR. IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PRACTICING RESPECT FOR HIS PROCLAMATION THAT, "MY FAITH IS FOR THE PEOPLE OF ALL CASTES AND ALL CREEDS FROM WHICHEVER DIRECTION THEY COME AND TO WHICHEVER DIRECTION THEY BOW." (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE FOLLOWING SUBJECTS: LANGUAGES, (IN PARTICULAR PUNJABI) SIKH BELIEFS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE".
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Coopers Road
BIRMINGHAM
B20 2JT
- Phone:
- 07940422209
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window