Financial history FRIENDS OF FERALS (SHEFFIELD)

Charity Number: 1170938
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £58.65k £50.20k £46.74k £59.71k £42.47k
Total expenditure £60.84k £44.11k £68.38k £40.06k £42.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A