SAMBROOK VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To Manage the Sambrook Village Hall for the community. Raise funds from events, private hire or through grants to keep the hall in a good state of repair and to standards to meet the needs of its users
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £1,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 03 August 1979: Standard registration
- SAMBROOK VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIEL ROBSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Helen Humphreys | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Briggs | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Evans | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Nudd | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tina Street | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Matthews | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Street | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR TOM MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR GEOFF FROST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JUDY FROST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.62k | £29.43k | £15.42k | £12.57k | £12.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.73k | £29.46k | £17.30k | £13.06k | £10.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £23.87k | £5.35k | £2.50k | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 16 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 27 APRIL 1979
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF CHETWYND IN THE COUNTY OF SALOP.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CHETWYND
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 SOUTH VIEW
SAMBROOK
NEWPORT
TF10 8AS
- Phone:
- 07872567318
- Email:
- jj101256@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window