REFUGEES WELCOME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting refugees within the Cheshire East area through SVPR currently
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £21,890 from 1 government contract(s) and £21,890 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 26 October 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Ann Campbell | Chair | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Aston Buttle | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Kinnersley Nixon | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David George Raines | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony James Smith | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gillian Ann Appleton | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|||||
ANNE TOWERS | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH MAYER | Trustee | 05 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.95k | £18.47k | £29.03k | £48.25k | £49.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.89k | £17.13k | £25.44k | £30.26k | £30.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £21.89k | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.40k | £10.00k | £17.50k | £21.89k | £21.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING, IN THE AREA OF CHESHIRE EAST AND ITS ENVIRONS, OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN NEED THEREOF SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY; AND 2) TO PROVIDE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND UNEMPLOYMENT AMONGST THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O MACCLESFIELD METHODIST CHURCH
WESTMINSTER ROAD
MACCLESFIELD
SK10 1BX
- Phone:
- 07753619372
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window