Financial history IMARA CIO

Charity number: 1170331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £423.63k £717.30k £914.39k £880.63k £861.92k
Total expenditure £392.49k £620.10k £864.27k £902.17k £1.01m
Income from government contracts £143.93k N/A £638.85k £746.69k £764.14k
Income from government grants £8.35k £416.39k £6.23k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £37.65k £63.47k £30.99k £56.16k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £1.56k £4.39k £10.36k £18.13k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £678.09k £846.53k £839.28k £787.63k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £620.10k £864.27k £899.91k £1.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £2.27k £477
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £3.27k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0