THE TRANSFORMING AUTISM PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote for the public benefit the advancement of health and the relief of young children in need by reason of autism, and those who care for them, by means of: providing resources for early intervention in the form of care and support, researching on the potential for early intervention and promoting public awareness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Guernsey
- Isle Of Man
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 May 2017: CIO registration
- TAP (Working name)
- THE TAP (Working name)
- TRANSFORMING AUTISM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James David Gray | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carla McLuskie | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edmund John Kamm | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Faye Long | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
GILLES PELENC | Trustee | 23 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.06k | £1.88k | £24.31k | £67.92k | £143.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.91k | £7.74k | £13.10k | £30.51k | £73.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 May 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF YOUNG CHILDREN IN NEED BY REASON OF AUTISM AND RELATED CONDITIONS, AND THOSE WHO CARE FOR THEM, BY MEANS OF: - PROMOTING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF SUCH CONDITIONS AND ON VARIOUS ASPECTS OF LIVING THEM WITH AND CARING FOR THOSE WHO HAVE THEM, BEGINNING WITH A FOCUS ON THE POTENTIAL OF EARLY INTERVENTION TO BRING ABOUT SIGNIFICANT IMPROVEMENTS. - PROVIDING RESOURCES FOR EARLY INTERVENTION, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF CARE AND TREATMENT OF PEOPLE WITH SUCH CONDITIONS; - PROMOTING APPROPRIATE RESEARCH ON THE POTENTIAL OF EARLY INTERVENTION IN SUCH CONDITIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Transforming Autism Project
167-169 Great Portland Street
5th Floor
W1W 5PF
- Phone:
- 02045260265
- Email:
- info@transformingautism.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window