Accounts and annual returns MADELUNGS DEFORMITY CHARITY

Charity number: 1171052
Charity reporting is up to date (80 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 April 2024 27 April 2025 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2024 27 April 2025 80 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 April 2023 27 August 2024 203 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2023 27 August 2024 203 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 April 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 06 April 2021 05 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2021 05 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 April 2020 18 May 2021 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2020 18 May 2021 101 days late Download Open in new window