BRIDGING THE GAP (MANCHESTER)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention or relief of poverty and the relief of those in need, hardship or distress in Greater Manchester by providing services and activities aimed at alleviating the social exclusion of those disadvantaged by their social and/or economic circumstances, reducing inequality and building strong, sustainable communities that empower people to be independent and in control of their lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £54,454 from 10 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
- Trafford
Governance
- 03 January 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHELLE MCHALE BEM | Chair | 03 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kimberley Peltier | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Usiobo | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Nicholson | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Pilkington | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Ann Mason | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chris Copestake | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARIE GRACE BRINDLE HAWKINS | Trustee | 03 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.96k | £153.61k | £101.06k | £244.74k | £238.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.02k | £70.71k | £74.36k | £156.76k | £214.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.52k | £15.93k | £8.16k | £20.50k | £54.45k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN GREATER MANCHESTER, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE CITY OF MANCHESTER AND TRAFFORD, BY PROVIDING SERVICES AND ACTIVITIES (INCLUDING THE OPERATION OF A FOODBANK) AIMED AT ALLEVIATING THE SOCIAL EXCLUSION OF THOSE DISADVANTAGED BY THEIR SOCIAL AND/OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, REDUCING INEQUALITY AND BUILDING STRONG, SUSTAINABLE COMMUNITIES THAT EMPOWER PEOPLE TO BE INDEPENDENT AND IN CONTROL OF THEIR LIVES. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Wesley Centre
Royce Road
MANCHESTER
M15 5BP
- Phone:
- 07842093922
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window