FIBRO FLARE AWARENESS GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising Awareness May 12th International Fibromyalgia/ME/CFS Light up the Night event. Annual fundraising event, Accrington.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 December 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BETH | Chair | 21 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sara-Louise Williams | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIE BRITTEN | Trustee | 21 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIAN PHILLIPS | Trustee | 21 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.03k | £2.13k | £141 | £280 | £363 | |
|
Total expenditure | £921 | £533 | £539 | £597 | £474 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 26 August 2024 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 26 August 2024 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 June 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 01 June 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 May 2022 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 30 May 2022 | 364 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 14 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 14 October 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE DIAGNOSED WITH FIBROMYALGIA, MYALGIC ENCEPHALOMYELITIS AND CHRONIC FATIGUE (FM/ME/CF) BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
77 St. Elphins Close
WARRINGTON
WA1 2ET
- Phone:
- 07879045147
- Email:
- fibroflaremag1@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window