THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS WITH ST COLUMB'S, NOTTING HILL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PCC's Charitable objects ( Promoting in the eccelstiastical parish the whole mission of the church) are primarily focused on the advancement of regigion, which is recognised as a charitable purpose having public benefit workship is provided free of charge and open to all. In addition, the PCC's activities as listed above have further public benefit: for example. offer teaching and education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 14 November 2016: Standard registration
- ALL SAINTS WITH ST.COLUMB'S PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL NOTTING HILL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosalind Jane Topping | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|||||
ROSS BUCHANAN | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER DE-BEN ROCKSON | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
GLADVIN ALLEN | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
PRISCILLA ANNA CONGREVE | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
VICTOR FERGUS | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN ELIZABETH SHAW | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARCENA PATRICIA PRIME | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL WILLIAM DEAN | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARCIA OLIVIA DIANE HAYNES | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
THEODORE LAWRENCE | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALLYSON INGRID WILLIAMS MBE | Trustee | 28 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.16k | £189.37k | £159.48k | £225.81k | £200.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.88k | £142.28k | £191.30k | £211.34k | £196.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.80k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 POWIS GARDENS
LONDON
W11 1JG
- Phone:
- 02077275919
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window