Accounts and annual returns YOUTH ENGAGEMENT PROGRAMME

Charity number: 1173368
Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 10 August 2024 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 10 August 2024 132 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 23 April 2023 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 23 April 2023 23 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 22 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 22 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 09 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 09 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window