MAYBE SOUTHWEST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maybe provides funding and access to psychotherapy for members of the public who are experiencing mental health needs not met by statutory services and unable to access therapy due to sufficient financial means.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- Gloucestershire
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 08 May 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STUART SCORGIE | Chair | 25 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Manoj Das | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Beever | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Draper | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARIE-CLAIRE FITZPATRICK | Trustee | 26 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 08/05/2020 | 08/05/2021 | 08/05/2022 | 08/05/2023 | 08/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.37k | £21.18k | £27.15k | £31.98k | £25.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.26k | £11.22k | £26.60k | £29.62k | £35.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 May 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 May 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 08 May 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 May 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 08 May 2022 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 May 2022 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 08 May 2021 | 15 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 May 2021 | 15 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 08 May 2020 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 May 2020 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 May 2017 as amended on 29 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
The preservation and promotion of good mental health and wellbeing through the provision of psychotherapy services to members of the public. In particular, to children and adults facing unmet mental health needs that fall outside of, or are not able to be met within, the scope of statutory services and who lack the financial resources to access private services.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Inwoods
Abbots Leigh Road
Abbots Leigh
BRISTOL
BS8 3QA
- Phone:
- 07941218072
- Email:
- maybesouthwest@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window