Financial history INSPIRING GIRLS INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

Charity number: 1171779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £197.23k £419.11k £850.90k £792.90k £879.62k
Total expenditure £198.61k £377.65k £636.84k £848.75k £951.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £850.90k £792.90k £879.62k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £636.84k £848.75k £951.89k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £205.50k £164.38k £222.38k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £409.86k £434.18k £498.74k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0