SYNEIDER MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity SYNEIDER MINISTRIES exist to serve the public by providing free teaching, preaching on the gospel of Jesus Christ to anyone all over the world. Holding prayer retreat services quarterly, conferences, empowerment meetings and worship events to promote the benefit of spiritual enrichment through the Christian faith through the names Ladies in the LORD and leaders in the LORD.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2018
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ghana
Governance
- 06 January 2017: CIO registration
- LADIES IN THE LORD (Working name)
- LEADERS IN THE LORD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SYNEIDER ADDY | Chair | 06 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MORRIS JOHNSON | Trustee | 06 January 2017 |
|
|||||
JOYCE REGINA TAYLOR | Trustee | 06 January 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £100 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 62 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 62 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 427 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 427 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 793 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 793 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1158 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1158 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1523 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1523 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH APPEARING IN CLAUSE 30(7)IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE REST OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES, WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED TO THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND TOLERANCE THROUGH EDUCATION AND EMPOWERMENT THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 ROWAN CRESCENT
STREATHAM VALE
LONDON
SW16 5JB
- Phone:
- 07903772005
- Email:
- syneider.taylor@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window