Financial history YIEWSLEY AND WEST DRAYTON ARTS COUNCIL

Charity number: 1173801
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £30.54k £30.09k £8.03k £13.98k £20.84k
Total expenditure £30.52k £18.88k £20.75k £23.25k £37.65k
Income from government contracts N/A £135 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £29.61k N/A N/A N/A