THE ALPINE FELLOWSHIP FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Charity are specifically restricted to the advancement of the arts and culture and the advancement of education in the fields of philosophy, literature and the arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Sweden
- United States
Governance
- 22 March 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACOB HUBERT LINUS BURDA | Chair | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALAN JAMES LAWSON | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL CHARLES LESSLIE | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £350.00k | £300.00k | £0 | £158.64k | £203.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £362.27k | £102.81k | £74.70k | £287.59k | £158.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
5.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS AND CULTURE AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE FIELDS OF PHILOSOPHY, LITERATURE AND THE ARTS, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: 5.1.1 THE HOLDING OF SYMPOSIA, LECTURES AND EVENTS FOR ARTISTS, PHILOSOPHERS AND OTHER LIKE-MINDED INDIVIDUALS TO SHARE EXPERTISE AND KNOWLEDGE; 5.1.2 THE PROVISION OF ART SCHOLARSHIPS OR GRANTS, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO SUPPORTING YOUNG TALENT AND UNDERPRIVILEGED ARTISTS AND ACADEMICS; 5.1.3 THE COMMISSIONING OF ART, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THEATRE, TEXTS, MUSIC, AND VISUAL ARTS; 5.1.4 THE COLLABORATION WITH ACADEMIC AND ARTISTIC INSTITUTIONS TO FURTHER THE HUMANITIES AND INTERDISCIPLINARY STUDY; 5.1.5 DISSEMINATING AND SHARING NEW THOUGHTS AND IDEAS IN RELATION TO ART,LITERATURE AND PHILOSOPHY, AND 5.2 SUCH OTHER PURPOSE OR PURPOSES THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O: 15 Quick Street
London
N1 8HL
- Phone:
- +498992502270
- Email:
- info@alpinefellowship.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window