WESTON SAILING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of amateur sport, specifically dinghy sailing, to promote health by involving physical and mental skill and exertion on an amateur basis for the public benefit primarily though not exclusively resident in the local and greater Southampton area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- 03 November 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nathan Ezra Steffenoni | Trustee | 14 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Goldsbrough | Trustee | 02 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gerry Sewell | Trustee | 02 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Conduit | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Curry | Trustee | 14 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.02k | £51.98k | £72.40k | £104.73k | £63.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.52k | £54.99k | £54.33k | £55.77k | £66.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.25k | £20.72k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 11 August 2022 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 11 August 2022 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 16 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 16 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Nov 2016 as amended on 03 Apr 2020 as amended on 13 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CLUB ARE TO PROMOTE AND FACILITATE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SAILING, AND IN PARTICULAR DINGHY SAILING, PRIMARILY (THOUGH NOT EXCLUSIVELY), TO THOSE RESIDENT IN THE LOCAL AND GREATER SOUTHAMPTON AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ABBEY HILL
NETLEY ABBEY
SOUTHAMPTON
SO31 5FB
- Phone:
- 02380452527
- Email:
- administrator@weston.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window