BETHANY CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The church operates from premises at Hetton Road, Houghton Le Spring, Tyne & Wear. Church membership is voluntary and free. The aim of the charity is a) To advance the Christian Faith in accordance with the Statement of Beliefs; b) The relief of persons who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress or who are aged or sick; c) To promote and fulfil such other charitable purposes .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £24,195 from 24195 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Darlington
- Durham
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 18 January 2017: Standard registration
- 12 July 2018: Funds received from 1060438 BETHANY CHURCH
- Bethany Church (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Anthony Rust | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Gill | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Keith | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £333.49k | £327.23k | £254.22k | £316.78k | £335.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £348.94k | £299.83k | £258.56k | £330.52k | £337.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £24.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH 2) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY 3) TO PROMOTE AND FULFILL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
BETHANY CHRISTIAN CENTRE
HETTON ROAD
HOUGHTON LE SPRING
DH5 8PF
- Phone:
- 01915121234
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window