THE ROWLAND BROTHERS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a free bereavement counselling service that offers practical and emotional support to those who have suffered the loss of a loved one. Running a schools project to provide specific bereavement and trauma Counselling for Children in Croydon. Assisting the preservation of war memorials and other public monuments in the area commemorating figures of historical importance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bromley
- Croydon
- Sutton
Governance
- 28 February 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN ROWLAND | Chair | 28 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Thomas Roe | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Anthony Spooner | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Redman | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Joseph Anthony Walkling | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Rowland | Trustee | 28 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.40k | £140.42k | £39.23k | £59.94k | £89.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.20k | £77.85k | £83.83k | £81.89k | £77.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
OBJECTS THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO (THE “OBJECTS”) ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: A) TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS AND THE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM BEREAVEMENT BY THE DEATH OF A PERSON, BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND FINANCIAL AND OTHER SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS; B) TO PRESERVE OR ASSIST IN THE PRESERVATION OF WAR MEMORIALS AND OTHER PUBLIC MONUMENTS IN THE AREA COMMEMORATING FIGURES OF HISTORICAL IMPORTANCE; AND C) TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE AREA AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE SUPPORT OF THE TERMINALLY ILL AND OF BEREAVED PERSONS. THE TRUSTEES WILL CARRY OUT ANY EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES ANCILLARY TO THE ABOVE CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND THE EXPRESSION “THE AREA” SHALL MEAN MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
299-303 Whitehorse Road
CROYDON
CR0 2HR
- Phone:
- 08000789636
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window